CLEAN WATER MODELLING ADVISORY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation provides an independent forum for users of clean water hydraulic models to advance the effectiveness of modelling through an annual conference for papers on how models are used to solve various industry problems. Papers are subsequently available free on our website. Workshops are held to provide training and develop best practice with a publication currently in preparation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN COCKRAM | Chair | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Barnes | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Robert Allen | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
FIONA PAGE | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Edward Croxton | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.88k | £0 | £0 | £19.39k | £18.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.22k | £1.52k | £284 | £15.73k | £32.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 OCT 2015 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF CLEAN WATER MODELLING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: •PROVIDING A FORUM FOR CLEAN WATER MODELLING PROFESSIONALS TO SHARE OPERATIONAL BEST PRACTICE •EDUCATING CLEAN WATER MODELLING PROFESSIONALS, WATER DELIVERY SERVICE AGENCIES AND THE PUBLIC BY HOLDING EVENTS, OPERATING A WEBSITE AND DISSEMINATING USEFUL LEARNING FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘CLEAN WATER MODELLING’ MEANS THE USE OF MATHEMATICAL MODELS, USUALLY COMPUTER BASED, OF A POTABLE WATER SUPPLY NETWORK TO ANALYSE THE SYSTEM’S HYDRAULIC BEHAVIOUR, TO DETERMINE THE EFFECT OF ANY CHANGES AND INVESTIGATE REMEDIAL MEASURES AND IMPROVEMENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yorkshire Water Plc
PO Box 500
Bradford
BD6 2LZ
- Phone:
- 01274692808
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window