Financial history WINDSOR FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 1166996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £151.64k £216.30k £99.15k £102.52k £130.99k
Total expenditure £823.71k £246.30k £104.08k £93.40k £78.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A