Trustees WINDSOR FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 1166996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Samuel Paul William Brewster Chair 03 March 2020
HENLEY ON THAMES CHURCHES DEBT CENTRE
Recently registered
Edward Mishambi Trustee 21 September 2022
None on record
Rev Edward Piers Bickersteth Trustee 11 August 2020
ARBORFIELD AND BARKHAM PARISH CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
THE DICK LUCAS TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEWS, ARBORFIELD
Received: On time
Clare Alexandra McKinnel Trustee 11 August 2020
None on record
Paul Gordon Williams Trustee 06 July 2019
None on record
ALICIA ANN FELCE Trustee 09 May 2016
None on record