Accounts and annual returns THE TAHIR ELCI HUMAN RIGHTS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1168509
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 February 2018 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 July 2018 163 days late