Accounts and annual returns BOLTON KURDISH ACADEMY

Charity number: 1167619
Charity reporting is overdue by 330 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 330 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 330 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 May 2022 573 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 February 2018 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 February 2018 98 days late Download Open in new window