BOLTON KURDISH ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Masjid for Prayers, Madressa (School) to Provide a safe enviroment for the children, community centre to provide other services to the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bolton
Governance
- 13 June 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RIZGAR IBRAHIM RASHID | Chair | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sami Yusuf Bakr | Trustee | 08 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
SARWAR YUNIS ALI | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ABBAS HAMID | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.01k | £21.24k | £19.92k | £13.79k | £24.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.54k | £5.94k | £10.89k | £7.87k | £13.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 November 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 April 2024 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2023 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2023 | 544 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 May 2022 | 573 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 04 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
2.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND EDUCATION MORE GENERALLY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2.3 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2.4 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. THE AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL MEAN THE AREA WITHIN A TEN MILE RADIUS OF THE CENTRE OF THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF BOLTON.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 VERNON WALK
BOLTON
GREATER MANCHESTER
BL3 6UR
- Phone:
- 07581358270
- Email:
- Rizgarib@gmail.com
- Website:
-
.none
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window