THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY HUDDERSFIELD

Charity number: 1168350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 April 2018 On time Download