THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY HUDDERSFIELD

Charity number: 1168350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steven Pape Trustee 09 November 2020 None on record
Rebecca Mosley Trustee 09 November 2020 None on record
Steven Dalton Trustee 17 May 2021 None on record
Flora Hawksbee Trustee 09 November 2020 None on record
Iain Spencer Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Rev MICHAEL RICHARD WILKINS Chair 15 July 2013 None on record
BEVERLEY PLAYLE Trustee 09 May 2016
HONLEY AND DISTRICT AID IN SICKNESS FUND Received: On time
Adam Mosley Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Paul Triner Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
Prof John Francis Playle Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
Adam Bland Trustee 09 November 2020 None on record
Karen Julien Trustee 09 November 2020 None on record
Lianne Woodward Trustee 09 November 2020 None on record
Sofia Wilkins Trustee 01 November 2018 None on record
CATHERINE BENTHAM Trustee 09 April 2017 None on record
Tania Webb Trustee 17 May 2021 None on record
KATE MCGUINN Trustee 09 November 2020 None on record