Trustees CHALFONTS U3A

Charity number: 1168664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Jane Barker Chair 08 May 2019
None on record
Chris Hardwick Trustee 21 July 2021
None on record
Geoff Clegg Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record
Gary Martin Tomlin Trustee 28 November 2019
None on record
Christine Elizabeth White Trustee 05 September 2019
None on record
Lesley Margaret Bedford Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
John Robert Hardwick Trustee 08 May 2019
None on record
Eileen Powell Trustee 08 May 2019
None on record
Michael Albert Lawson Trustee 18 June 2018
None on record
Peter Brady Trustee 10 May 2017
None on record
DAVID FRANK BURBIDGE Trustee 06 February 2015
CHALFONT ST. PETER COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
VALERIE EVALYN SMITH Trustee 06 February 2015
Friends of Chalfonts & GX Community Hospital
Received: On time