GIVE EDUCATION TO ALL (GETA)

Charity number: 1167092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 14 January 2021 344 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 06 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 31 March 2018 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required