Accounts and annual returns MOVE THE WORLD

Charity number: 1170656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 02 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 02 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 28 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 28 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 25 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 25 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 13 May 2019 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 13 May 2019 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 15 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 15 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window