BOSVALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1169100
Charity reporting is overdue by 53 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 53 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 53 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 September 2020 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 12 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 June 2018 On time Download