Financial history ALL SAINTS COMMUNITY PROJECT TRUST

Charity number: 1170179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £177.24k £148.91k £184.76k £194.17k £55.40k
Total expenditure £199.64k £119.28k £179.23k £151.17k £113.18k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £12.00k