1ST BRIERCLIFFE (ST JAMES) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 508111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £11.04k £17.92k £11.57k £13.40k £16.40k
Total expenditure £7.32k £16.34k £13.92k £13.83k £10.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k