Accounts and annual returns THE SEAN EDWARDS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1173947
Charity reporting is overdue by 587 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 222 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 222 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 587 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 587 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 November 2020 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 November 2020 24 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 November 2020 390 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 November 2020 390 days late Download Open in new window