Accounts and annual returns APRIL TRUST

Charity number: 1170020
Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 119 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 119 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 February 2023 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 484 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 February 2022 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 February 2022 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 March 2021 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 March 2021 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2021 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 January 2021 352 days late Download Open in new window