Accounts and annual returns GOWER HERITAGE & ENTERPRISE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1167678
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 April 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 April 2023 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 December 2021 | 225 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 December 2021 | 225 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 02 March 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 02 March 2020 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 23 April 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 23 April 2019 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window