GOWER HERITAGE & ENTERPRISE FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
restoring and refurbishing the Gower St School & bringing it back into use as a centre for the community with a focus on well-being, education and heritage of North Telford. Activities include fundraising, recording and interpreting heritage, community engagement and activities, consultation, securing consultants to enable the restoration to quality standard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- THE GOWER TELFORD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.94k | £31.77k | £2.81k | £962 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.68k | £33.58k | £5.30k | £632 | £949 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £55.28k | £12.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 April 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 December 2021 | 225 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 11 December 2021 | 225 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF ST GEORGES AND TELFORD (THE “LOCAL AREA”) IN SHROPSHIRE AND IN PARTICULAR AT THE GRADE II LISTED GOWER STREET, OLD SCHOOL HOUSE IN ST GEORGES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: · THE ADVANCEMENT OF HERITAGE · THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION · THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING · THE FURTHERANCE OF THE WORK OF CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES FALLING UNDER THE DESCRIPTION OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES (SET OUT IN S. 3 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011) BEING THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP OR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT · THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE LOCAL ENVIRONMENT AT THE GOWER STREET, OLD SCHOOL HOUSE SITE · THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE FROM THE LOCAL AREA WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window