THE HYMANS ROBERTSON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hymans Robertson Foundation partners with other charities to further two core campaigns: 1. Improving the Financial literacy of disadvantaged young people 2. Supporting long term local community projects, aimed at improving the lives of those in need The Foundation also matches funds raised by Hymans Robertson LLP employees and occasionally makes ad hoc donations, within Foundation objects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 August 2016: CIO registration
- HR FOUNDATION (Working name)
- HYMANS ROBERTSON FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILL TAIT | Chair | 21 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER CARVER | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul Waters | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abhishek Srivastav | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Atta Ul-Haque Yaqub | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Washbrooke | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Anne Steers | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jennifer Macmillan Nixseaman | Trustee | 16 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Emily Jane Gilmour | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £329.15k | £220.56k | £199.45k | £223.56k | £268.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £442.23k | £93.79k | £158.45k | £284.32k | £257.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 30 AUG 2016 AMENDED ON 28 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; 2. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES. AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO SUPPORT ACTIVITIES CARRIED ON IN PURSUANCE OF ANY OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE ANY APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR ANY PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Exchange Place One
1 Semple Street
Edinburgh
EH3 8BL
- Phone:
- 01316565000
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window