THE ROTARY CLUB OF ANDOVER BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE COMFORTS EITHER IN CASH OR KIND FOR THE RELIEF OF THE AGED POOR AND OTHER DESERVING PERSONS RESIDING WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF ANDOVER AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT IN THE MEMBERSHIP AREA OF THE CLUB AND TO MAKE CONTRIBUTIONS TO AND TOWARDS THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 September 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Carpenter | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Peacock | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Moulton | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.01k | £14.18k | £30.89k | £17.39k | £20.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.90k | £9.96k | £24.86k | £22.33k | £22.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE COMFORTS EITHER IN CASH OR KIND FOR THE RELIEF OF THE AGED POOR AND OTHER NECESSITOUS AND DESERVING PERSONS RESIDING WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF ANDOVER AND SUCH PARTS OF THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT AS ARE INCLUDED IN THE MEMBERSHIP AREA OF THE CLUB AND TO MAKE CONTRIBUTIONS TO AND TOWARDS THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS IN THE UNIED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
San Juan
The Chase
RINGWOOD
Hampshire
BH24 2AN
- Phone:
- 01425291889
- Email:
- dwmoulton@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window