Trustees MUSIC SUPPORT UK
Charity number: 1170231

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW THOMAS | Chair | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Suzi Green | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ward | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shamal Kumal | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Macleod | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Lander | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Kliffen | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JEREMY COHEN FCA | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ARTHUR FRANKS | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Philip Gadsdon | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.