Accounts and annual returns UNITED KINGDOM DISABLED GOLF UNION (UKDGU)

Charity number: 1167394
Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 22 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 22 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 17 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 May 2023 321 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 17 May 2023 321 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 May 2023 686 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 May 2023 686 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 May 2023 1051 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 May 2023 1051 days late Download Open in new window