Accounts and annual returns RHINO CONSERVATION BOTSWANA (UK) TRUST

Charity number: 1167450
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 149 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 149 days
Annual return 29 February 2020 Overdue Overdue by 697 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Overdue Overdue by 697 days
Annual return 28 February 2019 16 January 2020 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 16 January 2020 19 days late
Annual return 28 February 2018 29 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 29 November 2018 On time
Annual return 28 February 2017 16 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 November 2017 On time