Dogfen lywodraethu Vulnerable Persons Interventions
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 OCT 2017 as amended on 10 Nov 2017 as amended on 30 Apr 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects of the charity are as follows:- a. To relieve the needs of children who have been excluded/expelled from school and their families and carers in the UK by providing advice, advocacy, guidance and support to enable them to return swiftly back to education. b. To advance in life and relieve needs of children and adults in the UK and the neighbourhood, without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or of political, religious or other opinions by providing facilities in the interests of social welfare by associating together the said residents and the local authorities, voluntary and other organisations for recreation and leisure time occupation with the objective of improving the conditions of life for the residents. c. The relief of poverty or financial hardship, in particular but not exclusively by providing signposting and advocacy for the homeless d. To promote for the benefit of children and young people up to the age of 25 living in developing countries in Africa, Asia and the middle east by the preservation and protection of good mental and physical health and the advancement of education, in particular but not exclusively by providing such grants, items, facilities and training as shall be thought fit.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.