Accounts and annual returns THE GRAND THEATRE DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 508180
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 May 2021 308 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 04 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required