Financial history ABALON

Charity number: 1167443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £3.50k £4.88k £4.16k £15.91k £6.28k
Total expenditure £3.25k £2.00k £3.29k £9.59k £10.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A