NEWBIGIN COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1170076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 November 2018 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time Download