Accounts and annual returns SURVIVORS WEST YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 1168928
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 03 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window