Trustees DSDFAMILIES
Charity number: 1169896
Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dilyana Tosheva | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Sanders | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Edward Hopkins | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Chynoweth | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ieuan Arwel Hughes | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATE DAVIES | Trustee | 25 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.