BURNAGE FOODBANK

Charity number: 1169272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Oliver Cox Trustee 29 January 2020 None on record
STEVE BOURKE Trustee 12 January 2017 None on record
Azra Ali Trustee 29 November 2017
HALLE CONCERTS SOCIETY Received: On time
Leonard Brown Trustee 08 August 2018 None on record
JANE FRANKLIN Trustee 12 January 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET, BURNAGE Received: 36 days late
Rev Matthew Robert Michael Calladine chair Trustee 14 April 2021 None on record