Financial history ST ALBANS FOR REFUGEES

Charity number: 1167679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £80.46k £52.95k £48.27k £32.18k £32.56k
Total expenditure £80.89k £52.90k £49.26k £30.14k £15.78k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A