THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FERRING, DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
?Teaching, baptising and nurturing new and existing believers?Offering worship, prayer and learning?Assisting all to develop their knowledge of, and trust in, Jesus ?Provision of pastoral care for people living in the parish?Helping the poor and needy of the parish?Giving grants to missionary organisations ?Outreach by social activities ?Maintaining the fabric of the historic church building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 24 August 2016: Standard registration
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASSTICAL PARISH OF FERRING, DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John George Alexander Potter | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edmund Nicolas Young | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Harris | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SOPER | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Mason | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Gompertz | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY HARRIS | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN DOROTHY YOUNG | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN PRATT | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE BAIRD | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JOHN HALL | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.83k | £174.12k | £110.95k | £123.75k | £208.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.80k | £161.02k | £124.43k | £131.86k | £145.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 GRANGE PARK
FERRING
WORTHING
BN12 5LS
- Phone:
- 01903241645
- Email:
- standrewsferring@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window