Financial history SUPPORTERS OF CRAWSHAW ACADEMY

Charity number: 1167829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £7.00k £3.55k £3.57k £933 £3.18k
Total expenditure £3.94k £5.04k £4.81k £275 £4.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A