Financial history DEAL MARITIME AND LOCAL HISTORY MUSEUM

Charity number: 1168344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £18.63k £12.88k £12.13k £14.37k £17.16k
Total expenditure £15.84k £10.16k £6.33k £7.86k £15.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.80k £200 £10.87k £10.19k