Trustees DEAL MARITIME AND LOCAL HISTORY MUSEUM

Charity number: 1168344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Powell Trustee 23 April 2024
None on record
Ian Charles Redding Trustee 01 August 2023
SOUTHWARK TRAVELLERS' ACTION GROUP LTD
Received: 35 days late
Mark Kelly Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Fay Franklin Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Helga Wood Trustee 28 February 2022
None on record
Lisa Redding Trustee 19 April 2021
None on record
Kathryn Reilly Trustee 06 March 2019
None on record