Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH, CHARTHAM

Charity number: 1168636
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 March 2021 273 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required