Trustees SHERIFF HUTTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1169225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GILLIAN FIONA FAIRBOTHAM Chair 06 October 2016
None on record
Alan John Turner Trustee 23 January 2025
None on record
Nicholas John Page Trustee 28 November 2024
None on record
Moya Ingold Trustee 17 October 2024
None on record
Claire Elizabeth Wesley Trustee 06 May 2019
None on record
Stephen John Page Trustee 06 October 2016
None on record
PHILIP DAVID Trustee 06 October 2016
None on record