Governance THE FELLOWSHIP OF INDEPENDENT EVANGELICAL CHURCHES
Charity number: 1168037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 05 July 2016: CIO registration
- 22 February 2019: Funds received from 295551 SAWBRIDGEWORTH AND DISTRICT COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY ...
- 13 November 2019: Funds received from 251710 HEYWOOD EVANGELICAL CHURCH (INDEPENDENT)
- 31 March 2020: Funds received from 1123556 CHRISTIAN CONVENTIONS LTD
- 19 November 2021: Funds received from 256318 PROSTESTANT DISSENTING CHAPEL
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
- FIEC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.