DIYA'S (CARDIFF) LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAKING GRANTS AND PROVIDING A DROP-IN FACILITY OFFERING THESE PEOPLE A SAFE SPACE WHERE THEY CAN MEET, SOCIALISE AND OBTAIN ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO HELP WITH PROBLEMS THEY ARE ENCOUNTERING IN AND AROUND CAERPHILLY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS:- 1.THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; 2.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND 3.THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 05 May 2017: Standard registration
- 25 February 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 29/02/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.98k | £2.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.40k | £6.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 06 January 2020 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 SEP 2016 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARISE AS A RESULT OF OLD AGE OR DISABILITY, BY MAKING GRANTS AND PROVIDING A DROP-IN FACILITY OFFERING THESE PEOPLE A SAFE SPACE WHERE THEY CAN MEET, SOCIALISE AND OBTAIN ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO HELP WITH PROBLEMS THEY ARE ENCOUNTERING IN AND AROUND CAERPHILLY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS:- 1.THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; 2.THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND 3.THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION.
Area of benefit
IN AND AROUND CAERPHILLY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window