THE CRICKET ASYLUM FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1169846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 11 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 11 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 15 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 21 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 21 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 13 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 13 November 2018 On time Download