THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST HELEN, WADDINGTON

Charity number: 508358
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 28 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 10 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 22 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 06 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required