Trustees HASTINGS AND ROTHER SAMARITANS
Charity number: 1167881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Marsh | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Dyer | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Mulhern | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Williams | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Beckett | Trustee | 17 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penny Ainsley | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Persaud | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Bower | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Angel | Trustee | 30 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.