THE WOKINGHAM FOODBANK

Charity number: 1168522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 30 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 30 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 07 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 07 June 2018 On time Download