THE WOKINGHAM FOODBANK

Charity number: 1168522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lewis David Gent Trustee 17 August 2021 None on record
ANDREW REANEY Trustee 01 July 2020
READING FC COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time
JAN LONNON Trustee 16 July 2016 None on record
Sophie Louise Hobbs Trustee 17 August 2021 None on record
Rachel Burgess Trustee 07 November 2019 None on record
Samuel James Sudlow Trustee 17 August 2021 None on record
Dalia Ismail Trustee 17 August 2021 None on record
HELEN CRAIG Trustee 20 April 2018
WOKINGHAM FREE CHURCH BURIAL GROUND Received: On time