Financial history BILLIE'S FUND

Charity number: 1168109
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.06k £5.10k £589 £4.40k £4.60k
Total expenditure £8.24k £3.99k £918 £3.87k £2.85k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A