Financial history CARITAS DIOCESE OF SHREWSBURY

Charity number: 1169317
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £400.81k £442.09k £1.01m £618.79k £599.92k
Total expenditure £297.78k £398.45k £467.98k £518.53k £525.18k
Income from government contracts N/A £13.12k £52.07k £50.86k £57.71k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £309 £76.73k £18.55k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £868.33k £35.60k £334.30k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £1.01k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £129.05k £582.41k £265.53k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £1.51k £786 £80
Income - Other N/A N/A £5.78k £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £1.65k £565 £10.15k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £464.53k £518.17k £524.49k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £3.45k £359 £694
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £5.88k £1.50k £1.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0