RUDY A MENON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the company in the year under review was for the public benefit of the advancement of health and the saving of lives in particular by: 1. supporting, funding and facilitating research for rare brain cancers like Gliomatosis Cereberi; 2. raising awareness and providing support for families and patients inflicted with brain cancers, in particular Gliomatosis Cerebe
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £1,403 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 December 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIDHU MENON | Chair | 24 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUBITA ASHOK MAHTANI | Trustee | 18 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ARJUN MENON | Trustee | 18 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
SOMNATH MENON | Trustee | 24 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.84k | £57.88k | £45.44k | £48.98k | £64.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.36k | £24.95k | £32.65k | £31.75k | £35.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 MAY 2015 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES IN PARTICULAR BY: 4.1 SUPPORTING, FUNDING AND FACILITATING RESEARCH FOR RARE BRAIN CANCERS INCLUDING GLIOMATOSIS CEREBERI; 4.2 RAISING AWARENESS AND PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR FAMILIES AND PATIENTS INFLICTED WITH BRAIN CANCERS IN PARTICULAR GLIOMATOSIS CEREBERI; AND 4.3 CREATING AWARENESS AT A GLOBAL LEVEL BY ENGAGING WITH THE MEDICAL AND RESEARCH FRATERNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Grove Hall Court
Hall Court
London
NW8 9NY
- Phone:
- 07767822424
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window