KINGFISHER CHURCH, LITTLE PAXTON

Charity number: 1168532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 September 2019 606 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1361 days