Financial history DOBERMANN RESCUE U.K & EUROPE

Charity number: 1169697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £125.97k £105.81k £104.97k £84.63k £96.10k
Total expenditure £92.87k £86.06k £81.39k £79.91k £98.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A