Linked charities SAMARITANS BRIERLEY HILL BRANCH
Charity number: 1168020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/06/1974
AS AMENDED ON 18/06/1987
AS AMENDED ON 01/10/1991
AS AMENDED ON 01/06/1995
AS AMENDED ON 16/06/2004
AS AMENDED ON 20/06/2006
AS AMENDED ON 13/06/2012
Charitable objects
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN BRIERLEY HILL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
BRIERLEY HILL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Registration history
- 12 February 1975 : Standard registration
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.